Names of the Diocesan priests of Simdega Catholic Diocese
Date 01.01.2023
S.N | Priest’s Name | Birthday | Ordination day | |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Rev. Silas B. Surin | 08.01.1935 | 01.01.1967 | |
2 | Rev. Cornelius Tirkey | 14.01.1935 | 04.05.1969 | |
3 | Rev. Marianus G. Lugun | 06.09.1942 | 27.03.1971 | |
4 | Rev. John Kerketta | 19.05.1937 | 04.12.1971 | |
5 | Rev. Nestore Kullu | 02.10.1947 | 22.04.1978 | |
6 | Rev. Ernest Kerketta | 11.01.1946 | 20.04.1979 | |
7 | Rev. Marcus Bilung | 16.01.1948 | 20.04.1979 | |
8 | Rev. Eliazar Xaxa | 12.12.1945 | 01.01.1982 | |
9 | Rev. Alexander Tete | 09.03.1949 | 22.04.1982 | |
10 | Rev. Nichodeme Soreng | 15.03.1951 | 29.12.1982 | |
11 | Rev. Emil Dungdung | 11.05.1947 | 03.01.1983 | |
12 | Rev. Patrick Bara | 09.10.1953 | 23.04.1985 | |
13 | Rev. Phulgence P. Kullu | 21.03.1955 | 03.05.1986 | |
14 | Rev. Tobias Soreng | 12.02.1954 | 04.05.1986 | |
15 | Rev. Ambrose Dungdung | 23.10.1954 | 06.05.1986 | |
16 | Rev. Benjamin Kerketta | 25.02.1953 | 11.05.1986 | |
17 | Rev. Anand Ergat | 07.08.1956 | 29.04.1987 | |
18 | Rev. Nestore Ekka | 27.02.1956 | 02.05.1987 | |
19 | Rev. Philip Kiro | 14.06.1955 | 14.01.1989 | |
20 | Rev. Eric J. Kullu | 01.05.1957 | 16.01.1989 | |
21 | Rev. Edward Dungdung | 13.10.1956 | 03.04.1989 | |
22 | Rev. Bernard Dang | 04.07.1957 | 09.05.1989 | |
23 | Rev. Vitus Kerketta | 23.02.1959 | 20.01.1990 | |
24 | Rev. Ajit S. Singh | 02.03.1955 | 06.05.1991 | |
25 | Rev. Anthres Soreng | 17.02.1960 | 13.05.1991 | |
26 | Rev. Theodore Soreng | 19.12.1960 | 16.05.1991 | |
27 | Rev. Jailas Kullu | 01.01.1960 | 04.01.1992 | |
28 | Rev. Phulgence J. Kullu | 23.12.1958 | 06.05.1992 | |
29 | Rev. Raphael Kerketta | 05.07.1956 | 07.05.1992 | |
30 | Rev. Alois Tirkey | 12.10.1960 | 07.05.1992 | |
31 | Rev. Cornelius Kindo | 13.11.1959 | 06.05.1993 | |
32 | Rev. Paulus Lakra | 30.12.1960 | 07.05.1993 | |
33 | Rev. James Lakra | 23.08.1961 | 07.05.1993 | |
34 | Rev. Isidore Kerketta | 07.12.1959 | 08.05.1993 | |
35 | Rev. Felix S. Lakra | 09.10.1962 | 08.02.1994 | |
36 | Rev. Peter Minj | 10.10.1962 | 06.05.1995 | |
37 | Rev. Ignatius To:ppo | 16.02.1961 | 15.05.1995 | |
38 | Rev. Linus Burh | 08.01.1962 | 21.05.1995 | |
39 | Rev. George V. Kerketta | 02.12.1962 | 13.04.1996 | |
40 | Rev. Basil Soreng | 10.06.1963 | 12.05.1996 | |
41 | Rev. Peter Barla | 12.03.1964 | 18.04.1998 | |
42 | Rev. Barbat Kujur | 19.02.1965 | 28.01.1999 | |
43 | Rev. Ignatius Tete | 30.11.1964 | 05.04.1999 | |
44 | Rev. Alexander Kullu | 02.12.1964 | 17.04.1999 | |
45 | Rev. Bimal Lakra | 04.01.1966 | 25.04.2000 | |
46 | Rev. Suman Kr. Kullu | 29.10.1968 | 26.04.2000 | |
47 | Rev. Herman Xalxo | 25.10.1965 | 27.04.2000 | |
48 | Rev. Kishor Lakra | 27.05.1967 | 26.04.2001 | |
49 | Rev. Gabriel Dungdung | 22.07.1967 | 30.04.2001 | |
50 | Rev. Anil Bara | 13.02.1969 | 04.04.2002 | |
51 | Rev. Thomas Soreng | 02.02.1973 | 23.04.2003 | |
52 | Rev. Benedict Kujur | 16.02.1972 | 26.04.2003 | |
53 | Rev. Eugine Toppo | 26.07.1967 | 02.01.2004 | |
54 | Rev. Britius Tirkey | 14.12.1967 | 03.06.2005 | |
55 | Rev. Rajesh Kerketta | 10.12.1970 | 03.01.2006 | |
56 | Rev. Shashi Bhushan Kullu | 16.02.1972 | 19.04.2006 | |
57 | Rev. Francis Xavier Soreng | 21.09.1970 | 08.05.2006 | |
58 | Rev. Clement Lakra | 02.01.1970 | 10.05.2006 | |
59 | Rev. Ajit Paul Kerketta | 18.01.1971 | 12.05.2006 | |
60 | Rev. Francis X. Bilung | 07.04.1971 | 12.05.2006 | |
61 | Rev. Sunil Tirkey | 21.09.1971 | 12.05.2006 | |
62 | Rev. Dominic Barla | 16.08.1970 | 15.05.2007 | |
63 | Rev. Augustine Dungdung | 13.10.1971 | 17.05.2007 | |
64 | Rev. Augustine Lakra | 20.02.1973 | 06.05.2009 | |
65 | Rev. Bipin K. Soreng | 19.04.1975 | 10.04.2010 | |
66 | Rev. Sushil Guria | 13.01.1975 | 28.12.2010 | |
67 | Rev. Shailesh J. Kerketta | 10.09.1976 | 30.12.2010 | |
68 | Rev. Sebastian Ekka | 01.02.1977 | 05.05.2011 | |
69 | Rev. Henry S. Lakra | 28.06.1977 | 18.01.2012 | |
70 | Rev. Neelam R. Minj | 03.09.1978 | 20.01.2012 | |
71 | Rev. Joseph Tete | 31.12.1982 | 10.01.2013 | |
72 | Rev. Boniface Dungdung | 12.01.1974 | 16.01.2013 | |
73 | Rev. Sumilan S. Minj | 18.06.1977 | 03.02.2013 | |
74 | Rev. Edmond Bara | 19.11.1975 | 25.04.2013 | |
75 | Rev. TarcitiusTete | 01.03.1978 | 07.05.2013 | |
76 | Rev. Ranjit Dungdung | 12.04.1979 | 18.01.2014 | |
77 | Rev. John Kullu | 20.07.1979 | 23.01.2014 | |
78 | Rev. Benjamin Dungdung | 28.01.1978 | 30.01.2014 | |
79 | Rev. Damatius Xess | 16.03.1978 | 02.02.2014 | |
80 | Rev. Rajan D. Minj | 07.05.1983 | 26.10.2014 | |
81 | Rev. Bijay Kandulna | 17.08.1983 | 10.01.2015 | |
82 | Rev. Xavier A. Topno | 08.05.1982 | 11.01.2015 | |
83 | Rev. Ajit V. Soreng | 25.02.1978 | 15.01.2015 | |
84 | Rev. Arvind Xaxa | 04.02.1984 | 20.01.2016 | |
85 | Rev. Anup Toppo | 18.11.1980 | 21.01.2016 | |
86 | Rev. Fulgence Burh | 09.04.1981 | 28.01.2016 | |
87 | Rev. Anup Kujur | 02.10.1984 | 15.01.2017 | |
88 | Rev. Rajesh Topno | 22.01.1986 | 21.01.2017 | |
89 | Rev. Bimal Jojo | 28.11.1982 | 22.01.2017 | |
90 | Rev. Praween Minj | 07.02.1986 | 26.02.2017 | |
91 | Rev. Paulus Bage | 13.10.1978 | 23.04.2017 | |
92 | Rev. Herman Ergat | 06.09.1980 | 13.01.2018 | |
93 | Rev. Jeremias Tete | 20.02.1986 | 21.01.2018 | |
94 | Rev. Xavier M. Kandulna | 19.09.1987 | 27.01.2018 | |
95 | Rev. Sunil Surin | 10.08.1986 | 15.04.2018 | |
96 | Rev. Amrit Barwa | 14.07.1984 | 21.04.2018 | |
97 | Rev. Sandeep Xess | 01.07.1984 | 29.04.2018 | |
98 | Rev. Anand Prakash Baa | 25.05.1982 | 03.02.2019 | |
99 | Rev. Joseph Samad | 09.10.1981 | 10.02.2019 | |
100 | Rev. Vincent Jojo | 26.09.1979 | 24.02.2019 | |
101 | Rev. Fabain Dungdung | 22.01.1986 | 16.01.2020 | |
102 | Rev. Xavier Jojo | 14.07.1985 | 18.01.2020 | |
103 | Rev. Pradeep Kerketta | 15.11.1987 | 21.01.2020 | |
104 | Rev. Manuel Dang | 07.09.1991 | 02.02.2020 | |
105 | Rev. Rajen Soreng | 03.01.1987 | 09.02.2020 | |
106 | Rev. Anand Bh. Kerketta | 08.09.1986 | 17.01.2021 | |
107 | Rev. Pramod Xess | 11.02.1986 | 19.01.2021 | |
108 | Rev. Amit Kujur | 14.09.1990 | 09.05.2021 | |
109 | Rev. Patrick Barla | 24.02.1984 | 13.05.2021 | |
110 | Rev. SumanXalxo | 17.04.1988 | 16.05.2021 | |
111 | Rev. Roshan Soreng | 14.11.1986 | 16.01.2022 | |
112 | Rev. Ashok Lakra | 08.12.1985 | 10.02.2022 | |
113 | Rev. Albinus Kerketta | 18 .05.1988 | 24.04.2022 | |
114 | Rev. Anselam Lugun | 10.03.1985 | 28.04.2022 | |
115 | Rev. Shantiel Samad | 18.05.1986 | 28.04.2022 | |
116 | Rev. Patras Marki | 12.05.1988 | 12.05.2022 | |
& Vincent Barwa | ||||
Bishop of Simdega |